+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0623)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 623 (effective 7/1/18)
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB485ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 23-N)
- Passed House (76-Y 23-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 9-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #4
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Rereferred from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101853D
+ − Votes (7)
February 28, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 23-N)
February 23, 2018: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 9-N)
February 19, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2018: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2018: Rereferred from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor