+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Continued to 2023 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
- Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (5-Y 5-N)
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 22105708D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB482S1
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 22105708D-S1
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 1-N)
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104201D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 2, 2022: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (5-Y 5-N)
February 11, 2022: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2022: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor