+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (52)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Stricken from Senate calendar (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: STRIKE FROM CALENDAR R (39-Y 0-N)
On April 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 1, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB482ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (35-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE R (35-Y 4-N)
- Rec. of House sub. agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (24-Y 15-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE R (24-Y 15-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Substitute by Mr. Abbitt agreed to 989380100-H1
- Floor substitute printed 989380100-H1 (Abbitt)
- Engrossed by House - fl. sub. 989380100-H1 (Abbitt)
- Passed House with substitute (63-Y 36-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 36-N)
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Defeated by House (55-Y 42-N)
- VOTE: DEFEATED (55-Y 42-N)
- Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by House
- Passed by for the day
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 9-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 9, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (30-Y 6-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (27-Y 11-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (27-Y 11-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 989161635-E
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 1-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 989161635
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (12)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: STRIKE FROM CALENDAR R (39-Y 0-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE R (35-Y 4-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUBSTITUTE R (24-Y 15-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
March 11, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 36-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: DEFEATED (55-Y 42-N)
March 3, 1998: Reported from Finance (15-Y 9-N)
February 6, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (27-Y 11-N)
February 6, 1998: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (30-Y 6-N)
February 4, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1998: Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor