+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0184)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 184 (effective 7/1/14)
On February 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB481ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Higher Education
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101226D
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2014: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2014: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2014: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor