+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0827)
On April 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 827 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 26, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1996 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB481ER)
On March 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENTS (40-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 1996 in the House:
- Title replaced
On March 6, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 9-N)
- Passed House with amendments (89-Y 9-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendments by Mr. Kilgore agreed to
- Committee amendments #2, #3, #4, #5, #6, rejected
- Committee amendment #1 agreed to
- Read third time
On March 5, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 4, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amds. (17-Y 4-N)
On February 19, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 2
On February 16, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (26-Y 12-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 12-N)
On February 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 967434819-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 967434819-S1
On February 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (40-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
- Committee substitute printed 967434819-S1
On February 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with sub. (6-Y 4-N 4-A)
On January 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 967424819