+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On March 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0119)
On March 7, 1996 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 119 (effective 7/1/96)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On March 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB480ER)
On March 7, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (94-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1996 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On February 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB480ER)
On February 16, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
- Passed House (99-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Cons. & Natural Resources (20-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
- Assigned to C. N. R. sub-committee: 3
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (24-Y 14-N 1-A)
- Passed Senate (24-Y 14-N 1-A)
- Passed by temporarily
- Read third time
On February 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments rejected
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Mr. Gartlan agreed to 960062661-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - fl. sub. 960062661-S1
- Floor substitute printed 960062661-S1 (Gartlan)
On February 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read second time
On February 6, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp.(38-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On February 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/amds. (9-Y 6-N)
On January 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 960032661
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
March 7, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1996: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 1-N)
February 14, 1996: Reported from Cons. & Natural Resources (20-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (24-Y 14-N 1-A)
February 6, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1996: Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/amds. (9-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor