+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chair votes No
- Read third time and defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N)
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (7-Y 5-N)
On December 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 16101905D
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101905D