+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0939)
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 939 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB479ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 20-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB479H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 048712788-H1
- Read third time
- Passed House with substitute (79-Y 20-N)
On February 27, 2004 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 048712788-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
On February 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 043757112-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB479E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 043757112
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 3, 2004: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 20-N)
February 25, 2004: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2004: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2004: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor