+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Continued to 2019 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 by voice vote
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102416D
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health