+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
On May 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On May 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On May 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled
On April 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB476ER)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (38-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (38-Y 1-N)
- Rec. of Gov's recommendation agreed to (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (39-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation # 1,2 (92-Y 5-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 5-N)
- House rejected Gov's recommendation # 3 (42-Y 52-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (42-Y 52-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Governor
On April 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB476ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (30-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 985324743-E
On February 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 985324743
- Referred to Committee on Finance