+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 15, 2002 in the House:
- Continued to 2003 in C. C. T. (19-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
On January 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (35-Y 4-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (34-Y 6-N)
- Communicated to House
On January 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 026110520-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 24, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government w/amds (12-Y 3-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 026110520
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 15, 2002: Continued to 2003 in C. C. T. (19-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (35-Y 4-N)
January 28, 2002: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (34-Y 6-N)
January 24, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2002: Reported from Local Government w/amds (12-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor