+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0470)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 470 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB475ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102400D
+ − Votes (5)
February 25, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2010: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2010: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2010: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor