+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 5, 2006 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0319)
On March 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 319 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB473ER)
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by temporarily
On March 6, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 061429780-H1
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB473H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 2, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 061429780-H1
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments rejected
- Committee substitute agreed to 064639780-S1
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments by Senator Norment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB473ES1
- Printed as engrossed 064639780-ES1
On February 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 064639780-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 069823780
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
March 8, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2006: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2006: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2006: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor