+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 by voice vote
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101271D
+ − Votes (6)
March 1, 2018: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2018: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2018: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor