+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Tabled in Commerce and Labor by voice vote
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 10103328D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB471E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103328D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
January 26, 2010: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2010: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor