+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- No action taken by Courts of Justice by voice vote
On January 15, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (21-Y 0-N)
On December 20, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1996 in the House:
- Continued to 1997 in Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On February 10, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 9, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 965842665-E
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (40-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On February 6, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 1996 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: Public Safety
On January 24, 1996 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 965842665
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
January 15, 1997: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (21-Y 0-N)
December 20, 1996: Reported from C. J. with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1996: Continued to 1997 in Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1996: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
January 24, 1996: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd. (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Virgil H. Goode, Jr.
Type:
Primary Sponsor