+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0442)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0442)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 442 (effective 7/1/16)
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB467ER)
- Enrolled
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N)
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB467S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 16105223D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 16105223D-S1
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100972D
+ − Votes (6)
February 29, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2016: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2016: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor