+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0621)
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 621 (effective 7/1/08)
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB466ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 29, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 27, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (23-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement (Jones, S.C.)
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081161828
+ − Votes (5)
March 3, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2008: Reported from Appropriations (23-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2008: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2008: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor