+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0377)
On April 6, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 377 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 26, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB464ER)
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 2, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 4
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
On February 4, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Printed as engrossed LD8107701 (SB464E)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (36-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from P. & E. with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed