+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 11, 1996 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0612)
On April 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 612 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 26, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1996 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB464ER)
On March 7, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 8-N)
- Passed House (86-Y 8-N)
- Read third time
On March 6, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 5, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 4, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 1, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (19-Y 3-N)
On February 15, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 1996 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (39-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On February 11, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Wills/Trusts/Estates
On January 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 969812000
+ − Votes (6)
March 7, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 8-N)
March 1, 1996: Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (19-Y 3-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1996: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor