+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0376)
On April 6, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 376 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB463ER)
On February 23, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed LD5701733 (SB463E)
On February 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed