+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 by voice vote
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Higher Education
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute rejected 18105491D-S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18105837D-S2
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB462S2
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Incorporates SB849 (Cosgrove)
- Committee substitute printed 18105837D-S2
- Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Incorporates SB849 (Cosgrove)
- Committee substitute printed 18105491D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100096D