+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0121)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 121 (effective 7/1/12)
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB461ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 28-N)
- Passed House (69-Y 28-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 4-N)
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N)
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 2-N)
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N)
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Rereferred from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103498D
+ − Votes (6)
February 20, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 28-N)
February 15, 2012: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 4-N)
February 2, 2012: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N)
January 31, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 2-N)
January 30, 2012: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N)
January 19, 2012: Rereferred from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor