+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0909)
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Reenrolled bill text (SB461ER2)
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: (37-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Reenrolled
- Enacted, Chapter 909 (effective 7/1/06)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 18, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB461ER)
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- Read third time
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 31, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (37-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On January 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 069822726-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB461E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 069822726
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (11)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: (37-Y 1-N)
February 28, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2006: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2006: VOTE: (37-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2006: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor