+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Tabled in General Laws (13-Y 9-N)
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 22104654D-S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB461S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 22104654D-S1
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103973D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 24, 2022: Tabled in General Laws (13-Y 9-N)
February 10, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2022: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2022: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2022: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor