+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0629)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 629 (effective 7/1/14)
On March 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB460ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N)
- Passed House (92-Y 6-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N)
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Assigned Education sub: Higher Education
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB460S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104047D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 14104047D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Higher Education
On January 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102033D
+ − Votes (6)
February 28, 2014: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N)
February 26, 2014: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N)
February 25, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2014: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor