+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0201)
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 201 (effective 7/1/08)
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB46ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On January 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB46S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 080253304-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 080253304-S1
On January 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On December 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081691866