+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (52)
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0803)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB459ER2)
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- Reenrolled
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 0-N)
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 803 (effective 7/1/10)
On April 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 22, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB459ER)
On March 14, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N)
On March 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- Delegates: Griffith, Iaquinto, Barlow
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senators: McEachin, Petersen, Vogel
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 37-N)
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB459H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 10105695D-H1
- Read third time
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 10105695D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB459E
- Printed as engrossed 10103266D-E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned GL&T sub: FOIA/Conflict of Interest
On January 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103266D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (13)
April 21, 2010: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
April 21, 2010: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
March 14, 2010: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
March 12, 2010: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 10, 2010: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2010: House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 37-N)
March 4, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2010: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2010: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2010: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor