+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On February 19, 2002 in the House:
- Passed by indefinitely in C. & L. (12-Y 9-N)
On February 4, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On January 24, 2002 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 025470508-ES1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 025470508-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 025470508-S1
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments by Sen. Norment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee sub w/amdts. 025470508-ES1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N 2-A)
- Passed Senate (22-Y 13-N 2-A)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (36-Y 0-N 2-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (22-Y 13-N 2-A)
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (37-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N 1-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (23-Y 12-N 2-A)
- Passed Senate (23-Y 12-N 2-A)
On January 23, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 025470508-S1
On January 21, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from C. & L. with substitute (8-Y 5-N 1-A)
On January 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Commerce and Labor
- Pursuant to S.Rule 20(j),rereferred by Fin. (16-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 023836880
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
February 19, 2002: Passed by indefinitely in C. & L. (12-Y 9-N)
January 24, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (22-Y 13-N 2-A)
January 24, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (36-Y 0-N 2-A)
January 24, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (23-Y 12-N 2-A)
January 24, 2002: VOTE: RECONSIDER (37-Y 0-N 1-A)
January 23, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2002: Reported from C. & L. with substitute (8-Y 5-N 1-A)
January 15, 2002: Pursuant to S.Rule 20(j),rereferred by Fin. (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor