+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N)
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Senator Newman agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB456E
- Printed as engrossed 18102475D-E
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102475D
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health