+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On July 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On July 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB451ER)
- Enrolled
On July 20, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On June 17, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (88-Y 1-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (88-Y 1-N)
On June 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Conference substitute printed 22208238D-S2
- Amended by conference committee
On March 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (17-Y 23-N)
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- House insisted on substitute
- Delegates: McNamara, Durant, Keam
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Boysko, Barker, Norment
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 22106924D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB451H1
- Passed House with substitute (95-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: Passage (95-Y 4-N)
- Passed House with substitute (98-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: Passage #2 (98-Y 1-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 22106924D-H1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 1-N)
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N)
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB451S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 22105822D-S1
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Incorporates SB609 (DeSteph)
- Incorporates SB571 (Newman)
- Incorporates SB380 (McDougle)
- Committee substitute printed 22105822D-S1
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100388D