+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (19-Y 21-N)
- Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (39-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On February 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (10-Y 5-N 2-A)
On January 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (8-Y 7-N)
On January 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 960010661