+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 335 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0335)
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB451ER)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Title replaced 18107282D-H1
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Amendment by Delegate Carr agreed to
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment SB451H1
- Passed House with substitute with amendment (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107282D-H1
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107282D-H1
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106172D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB451S1
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with substitute (12-Y 1-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106172D-S1
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101378D
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
+ − Votes (6)
February 27, 2018: House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2018: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
February 1, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2018: Reported from Local Government with substitute (12-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor