+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Continued to 2015 in Appropriations by voice vote
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2015 by voice vote
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 1-N)
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102235D
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 2014: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 1-N)
February 7, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2014: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2014: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor