+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0517)
On April 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 517 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 29, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 28, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB450ER)
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 8, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 3/4
On February 17, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Printed as engrossed LD1200739 (SB450E)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 9, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
March 7, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd. (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor