+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 622 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0622)
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB450ER)
- Enrolled
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 18107034D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107034D-H1
- Read third time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB450H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 18107034D-H1
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104461D
+ − Votes (6)
March 6, 2018: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2018: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 11, 2018: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor