+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0690)
On April 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 690 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 30, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 29, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 21, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB449ER)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Read third time
- Passed House with substitute (97-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read second time
On March 2, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD7962124 (SB449H1)
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate-comm. substitute/w amdt.
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute with amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- Printed as engrossed LD3762739 (SB449ES1)
On February 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD3762739 (SB449S1)
On February 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
March 8, 1994: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
March 7, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
March 2, 1994: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1994: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor