+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0506)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 506 (effective - see bill)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/11/16
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB446ER)
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 34-N)
- Passed House (65-Y 34-N)
- Read third time
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 7-N)
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N)
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (7-Y 6-N)
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102130D
+ − Votes (6)
March 8, 2016: VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 34-N)
March 4, 2016: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 7-N)
February 29, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N)
February 2, 2016: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
January 21, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2016: Reported from Privileges and Elections (7-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor