+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0700)
On April 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 700 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB444ER)
On February 27, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 5-N)
- Passed House (95-Y 5-N)
- Read third time
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (21-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB444S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 048246804-S1
- Communicated to House
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 048246804-S1
- Reported from Transportation w/sub (13-Y 1-N 1-A)
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 046437804
+ − Votes (6)
February 27, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 5-N)
February 24, 2004: Reported from Tra. (21-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2004: Reported from Transportation w/sub (13-Y 1-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor