+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0735)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 735 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB443ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (20-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Gubernatorial Appointments
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100022D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 26, 2020: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2020: Reported from Privileges and Elections (20-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2020: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
John S. Edwards
Type:
Primary Sponsor