+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 26, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0657)
On April 8, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 657 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 13, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB441ER)
On February 28, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 3-N)
- Passed House (92-Y 3-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (23-Y 2-N)
On February 14, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 5
On February 2, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On January 31, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 004620200
+ − Votes (5)
February 28, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 3-N)
February 23, 2000: Reported from General Laws (23-Y 2-N)
January 31, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2000: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2000: Reported from General Laws (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor