+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- No further action taken
- Failed to pass
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB44E
- Printed as engrossed 18100496D-E
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 1-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On November 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100496D
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services