+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0156)
On March 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 156 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 12, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB44ER)
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
On January 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/18/03 040408760
+ − Votes (5)
February 24, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2004: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2004: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor