+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On March 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass in Senate
- No further action taken
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Delegates: Gilbert, Albo, McClellan
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senators: Watkins, Barker, Miller
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on amendment
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- House amendment rejected by Senate (4-Y 36-N)
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Ethics
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Rules
- Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
On December 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100109D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
March 4, 2014: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2014: House amendment rejected by Senate (4-Y 36-N)
February 26, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2014: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2014: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2014: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor