+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (65)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute with amendments waived
- Stricken from Senate calendar (22-Y 18-N)
- VOTE: STRIKE FROM CALENDAR R (22-Y 18-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 989377811-H1
- Amendments by Ms. Puller agreed to
- Amendment by Mr. Clement agreed to
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Amendments by Mr. Wilkins rejected (24-Y 74-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (24-Y 74-N)
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Amendment by Mr. Marshall rejected (21-Y 75-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (21-Y 75-N)
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Amendment by Mr. Marshall rejected (35-Y 65-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (35-Y 65-N)
- Amendment by Mr. Dudley rejected (25-Y 74-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (25-Y 74-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. w/amds. 989377811-H1
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Passed House with sub. with amendments (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with sub. (24-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Committee substitute printed 989377811-H1
On February 23, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Previous question ordered (21-Y 19-N)
- VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION R (21-Y 19-N)
- Committee substitute rejected 985436629-S1
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment #1 by Sen. Saslaw withdrawn
- Reading of substitute waived
- Floor substitute printed 985438681-S2 (Holland)
- Substitute by Sen. Holland rejected (17-Y 23-N)
- VOTE: FLOOR SUB., HOLLAND V (17-Y 23-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Floor substitute printed 985440629-S3 (Chichester)
- Substitute by Sen. Chichester agreed to 985440629-S3
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment #2 by Sen. Saslaw rejected (17-Y 22-N)
- VOTE: FLOOR AMENDMENT V (17-Y 22-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments #3 thru 6 by Sen. Hanger rejected
- Amendment #7 by Sen. Hanger withdrawn
- Engrossed by Senate - fl. sub. 985440629-S3
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 1-N)
- Passed Senate (31-Y 9-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (31-Y 9-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 18, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 4-N)
- Committee substitute printed 985436629-S1
On February 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: Special
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 984513811
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (14)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: STRIKE FROM CALENDAR R (22-Y 18-N)
March 11, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (24-Y 74-N)
March 11, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (21-Y 75-N)
March 11, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (35-Y 65-N)
March 11, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (25-Y 74-N)
March 11, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: Reported from Finance with sub. (24-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1998: VOTE: FLOOR AMENDMENT V (17-Y 22-N)
February 19, 1998: VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION R (21-Y 19-N)
February 19, 1998: VOTE: FLOOR SUB., HOLLAND V (17-Y 23-N)
February 19, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 1-N)
February 19, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (31-Y 9-N)
February 18, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsors (58)
Type:
Primary Sponsor