+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0719)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 719 (effective - see bill)
On March 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB437ER)
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (27-Y 12-N)
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 16-N)
- Passed House with amendments (82-Y 16-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 3-N)
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N)
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB437S1
- Chair votes No
- Motion to rerefer to committee rejected (20-Y 20-N)
- Amendment by Senator Stuart rejected
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 12105271D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 12105271D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 7-N)
On January 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103656D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
March 8, 2012: House amendments agreed to by Senate (27-Y 12-N)
March 7, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 16-N)
March 2, 2012: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 3-N)
February 14, 2012: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N)
February 13, 2012: Motion to rerefer to committee rejected (20-Y 20-N)
February 10, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2012: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 7-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor