+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0544)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 544 (effective 7/1/22)
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB434ER)
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Energy (22-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB434S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 22105029D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 22105029D-S1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101750D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 8, 2022: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2022: Reported from Commerce and Energy (22-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2022: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2022: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2022: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor