+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0680)
On April 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 680 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB432ER)
On March 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Motion to place back on the calendar agreed to
- Passed by for the day
On February 26, 2002 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Passed by for the day
On February 25, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 22, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from C. C. T. with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2002 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 023768460