+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 11, 1996 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0611)
On April 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 611 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 18, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 15, 1996 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB432ER)
On February 28, 1996 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 26, 1996 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 22, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1996 in the House:
- Motion to refer to committee agreed to
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
On February 16, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (22-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Read first time
On February 2, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On January 31, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (40-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On January 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed 960612739