+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Stricken from Senate calendar (40-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N 2-A)
On January 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100011D
+ − Votes (3)
January 23, 2012: Stricken from Senate calendar (40-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2012: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N 2-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor